Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Karen Olmstad, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018135979 Book: 7567 Page: 4079 View: 2018135979 | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | dtd 09/20/06 Instrument: 2018135972 Book: 7567 Page: 4060 View: 2018135972 | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Follow up | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | of Clarification of decedent's name by Karen Olmsted | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | follow up | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | of Withdrawal of Codicil by Karen Olmsted | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | failure to comply w/OR dtd 03/06/18 | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Summary | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Follow up |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.