Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sharon Virginia Taylorsims, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2017162950 Book: 7437 Page: 4786 View: 2017162950 | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | of Non_Resident Instrument: 2017159042 Book: 7435 Page: 3576 View: 2017159042 | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | follow-up Review | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | To file an amended ptn for summary adm, until 08/30/17 | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | To extend time to file amended ptn for summary admin, for 15 days | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | summary admn | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Jimmy Alen Sims (KY) | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | from Kentucky *25pgs Instrument: 2017159045 Book: 7435 Page: 3584 View: 2017159045 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.