Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mary Michaud, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | dtd. 08/23/2016 Instrument: 2017158396 Book: 7435 Page: 1569 View: 2017158396 | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2017158639 Book: 7435 Page: 2220 View: 2017158639 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | follow-up to Summary Testate | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Worksheet (Testate summary adm) | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | dtd 03-06-2017 *REC 5pgs Instrument: 2017158390 Book: 7435 Page: 1559 View: 2017158390 | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | order - no action taken | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | of last will & testament | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Dennis Charles Bradley (unable to record) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.