Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Peggy Prince, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | w/out prej by American Express Centurion Bank Instrument: 2018076529 Book: 7533 Page: 1519 View: 2018076529 | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PLURIES as to Peggy Prince etc | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PLURIES To PEGGY PRINCE AKA PEGGY A PRINCE fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | to Peggy Prince etc | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | (Alias) Peggy Prince aka Peggy A Prince | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ALIAS To PEGGY PRINCE, AKA PEGGY A PRINCE rtn to atty/sop via e-service | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Peggy Prince etc | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Peggy Prince aka Peggy A Prince | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.