Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand with Randell H. Rowe, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | w/o prej by Ally Bank Instrument: 2018073800 Book: 7531 Page: 3563 View: 2018073800 | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Sommer Hughes | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Sommer Hughes | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Joshua Donald Papsdorf | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | by Linda Thueringer | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | OK for Stephen E Thuringer and Linda Thueinger to appear by phone at 8/28/17 hearing | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | by Ally Bank | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Stephen P Thueringer | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | by Linda Thueringer (Non Party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.