Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Christopher Correa, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Elizabeth Anne Buckland, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryFamily Law |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment/Cetificate of Delinquency as to Christopher Correa Instrument: 2018069689 Book: 7529 Page: 2616 View: 2018069689 | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | as to Christopher Correa | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Christopher Correa | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | by DOR | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | to Department of Health | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | to update records & copies by atty Sheila M Ennis | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | trial by pet | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | w/ settlement agreement **0 copies/ 0 envs** Instrument: 2017148084 Book: 7429 Page: 864 View: 2017148084 | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | by Pet | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | paternity settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.