Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Robert H Zipperer, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2021142760 Book: 8067 Page: 4260 View: 2021142760 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | pltf's counsel to file status report | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | status by Suntrust | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | pltfs counsel to file status report w/20 days | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Robert H Zipperer #6:17-bk-05252-CCJ Instrument: 2017160634 Book: 7436 Page: 3071 View: 2017160634 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | by Suntrust Bank | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Robert H Zipperer to mediate | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | **no mediator listed** | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.