Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2017176893 Book: 7446 Page: 1468 View: 2017176893 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Deborah Gerberman | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Deborah C Gerberman | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Deborah C Gerberman | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | complaint and Strike Exhibits by Frederick M Gerberman | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | of Douglas A Kneller,Esq. obo Frederick M Gerberman | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | by Douglas A Kneller,Esq | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Summons,exec as to Frederick M Gerberman | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Frederick M Gerberman | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.