Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Paul E Davis, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time399 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 4/05/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 12/31/2008 OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. AS TO PAUL E DAVIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/08/09 Not Applicable |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 29 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.