Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
James L Jeffries, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Tereasa E Causey, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryFamily Law |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | term of IV-D svcs | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | of conclusion of representation by atty Rachel D Myers obo resp | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | by DOR | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.