Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Dan Woody | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | 2 copies/env Instrument: 2017023591 Book: 7357 Page: 1087 View: 2017023591 | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Pamela Ann Woody | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | by Pamela Woody | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | both parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.