Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2016 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Chrinstin King Stephens Instrument: 2018120359 Book: 7558 Page: 3143 View: 2018120359 | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | follow up | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | to order from court by Christine King Stephens | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Dsc | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | discharge | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benef Cns to Dsc by Christine King Stephens Trust Benef | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benef Cns to Dsc by Christine King Stephens Trustee | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benef Cns to Dsc by Christine King Stephens | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | for Final Acctg. & Dsc. until 04/30/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.