Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Council On Aging Of Volusia County Inc, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | of OR Detrmn Incapacity to Kim Heller,II & Jean Beatrice Haney | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Neil Oslos, MD, Betty Bullock RN & Ann Gentile. | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Court grants OR to Det. Incap. | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Total Instrument: 2016054174 Book: 7233 Page: 38 View: 2016054174 | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | (Infml)of Ntc of Pet to Determn Incapacity & for Appt of Gdn | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | by Elisor | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | by Elisor | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | (Infml)of Nt of Pet to Detemn Incapacity & Appt of Gdn | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | by Council on Aging | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Examining Committee Members |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.