Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
James Edward Tidwell filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | dsc | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2016161671 Book: 7296 Page: 3141 View: 2016161671 | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Full, Rcpt of Benef & Csn to Dsc, by Jeffrey L Tidwell | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Full, Rcpt of Benef & Csn to Dsc, by Patricia Lynn Brigance | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | (Fml) Petition for Discharge, to Florida Hospital DeLand | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2016101768 Book: 7261 Page: 1813 View: 2016101768 | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | *Sent to recording 09/15/2016* Instrument: 2016171914 Book: 7302 Page: 4671 View: 2016171914 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.