Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Maureen M Martin-Gochee Instrument: 2017193436 Book: 7456 Page: 716 View: 2017193436 | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | DSC | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | by James F. Martin | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | by Patrick Martin | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | by Maureen Martin-Gochee | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | & Cns. to Distr. by Patrick E. Martin | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Cns. to Dsc. by James F. Martin | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | fee by Maureen Martin-Gochee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.