Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jennipher Lynn Moody, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Benjamin Reavis Williams, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts New Smyrna Beach Annex with Matthew M. Foxman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew M. Foxman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryFamily Law |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseNew Smyrna Beach Annex |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | of docket 47.000 per AO-2010-215 | |
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event | mtn to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction & other grounds | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | by Benjamin Reavis Williams | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | by Atty Feuerstein obo Benjamin Williams | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | and directing pretrial procedure | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | notice of withdraw of motion to appoint guardian ad litem by Jennifer Moody | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | designation of email addresses by James Feuerstein |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.