Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mitchell, Ciara Noel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mitchell, James Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION VIA ZOOM | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RE-DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE/FINAL HEARING | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 1/10/2024 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS FOR MEDIATION | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 11/15/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.