Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: GROEB , ROBERT K assigned | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 632022DR000115DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2022 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 5/19/2022 DUVAL ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO UNION COUNTY, FLORIDA | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DUVAL 10/23/2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (COURT ORDERED) 11/18/2019 8:30 AM | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN RECIEPT OF TRANSFER | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DUVAL 16-2019-DR-004173-FMXX-MA DOCKET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.