Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mcdougald, Jina Ash, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcdougald, Christopher, Mcdugald, Chritopher, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ARREARAGE ORDER | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ESTABLISH ARREARAGE AND FOR PAYMENTS ON ARREARAGE | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING HEARING 6/29/2023 BEFORE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for DR Other on 4/27/2023 | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 6/29/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPOSITORY REQUEST FOR ACCOUNT ADJUSTMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.