Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Morrison, Brett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morrison, Kayla, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 5/15/2023 at 0115 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Petitioner Attorney: Michael B Gibson Assigned to BRETT MORRISON | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - BRETT MORRISON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.