Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mcdonald, Latiyah Chardonnay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shanks, Wendell Lorenzo Jr, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE OR ABATE ORDER OF SUPPORT | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING HEARING BEFORE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER MAILED TO WENDELL LORENZO SHANKS JR RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 4/27/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFFERENCING HEARING 4/27/2023 BEFORE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE OR ABATE ORDER OF SUPPORT | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for DR Other on 12/16/2022 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.