Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hahn, John C., Link, Mark A., filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Curtis, Ryan Colby, against Bangert, Michael W., represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
|
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ABATE
Date: November 02, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND HEAIRNG ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 20, 2022STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL
Date: May 16, 2023COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION WITH STANDING CASE MANAGMENT ORDER
Date: September 20, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE MICHAEL BANGERT 10-12-2022
Date: October 18, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO
Date: September 20, 2022HEARING FORM
Date: April 24, 2023HEARING FORM
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND HEAIRNG ON PENDING MOTIONS | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 5/17/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 4/19/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 2/22/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.