Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hunt, Charles Ray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hunt, Earnestine, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00 | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 20299 | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA ZOOM | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.