Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Levon-Bell, Christian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 1/12/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 632021DR000197DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/14/2021 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION TO CHANGE NAME (ADULT) | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF FL ID CARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.