Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Simpson, Jamie Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Simpson, Eric David, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT WIFE #1 | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 8/30/2022 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
July 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT OF ERIC SIMPSON | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.