Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sharp, Tasha Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sharp, Christopher Todd, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION CHRISTOPHER TODD SHARP 4-HOUR PARENT EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION COURSE | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 5/20/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | WIFE'S MOTION TO COMPEL MANDATORY DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.