Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Green, Kaleb, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clemons, Chelsea, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OUTCOME OF MEDIATION - FULL AGREEMENT | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING MEDIATION | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION - NO AGREEMENT | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $120.00 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 23383 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.