Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Simmons, Jimmica Ebony Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carr, Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
January 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
January 23, 2022 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE/FINAL HEARING | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 2/16/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROGRAM FAMILY MEDIATION VIA ZOOM | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.