Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rogers, Tara Daniell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Henley, Katlin Marie, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF IV-D SERVICES | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER TERMINATING SUPPORT, DETERMINING ARREARS AND ESTABLISHING PAYMENT ON ARREARS | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: GROEB , ROBERT K assigned | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 632021DR000136DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2021 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.