Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Lauren, Lowery, Lauren A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lauver, Christopher Gene, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS LAUREN LOWERY | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER OF AGREEMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER GENE LAUVER | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER GENE LAUVER | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons disposition on 8/3/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.