Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rosier, Ashley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rosier, Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERT GROEB presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 15-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $5.00 | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $5.00 Receipt Number MX 20231 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 5/12/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE 5/12/2021 AT 10:30AM | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.