Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Violet, Sumner, Violet Avinger, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robinson, Jennifer Ramae, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with FERRERO, DENISE RAE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFERRERO, DENISE RAE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DOR'S PETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING HEARING 10/8/2020 MAILED TO JENNIFER RAMAE ROBINSON RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING HEARING 10/8/2020 | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 10/8/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding. | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons disposition on 7/20/2020 | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 632020DR000084DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2020 | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.