Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Williams, Tiera La Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gordon, Timothy Lenard Jr, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ENFORCING DOR/CSE ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 7/27/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VDEO CONFERENCING HEARING 7/27/2023 BEFORE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY LENARD GORDON JR | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.