Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sardo, Schenita Deneane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sardo, Joseph Frank, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with FERRERO, DENISE RAE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFERRERO, DENISE RAE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $2.00 | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $2.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $8.00 Receipt Number MX 17761 | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 7/15/2020 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding. | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING 7/15/2020 AT 11:30AM | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 6/24/2020 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.