Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Aderholt, Mary Johns, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with FERRERO, DENISE RAE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFERRERO, DENISE RAE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING REPORT OF LEGAL CHANGE OF NAME- MAILED TO VITAL STATISTICS ON 7/2/21 | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE 6/10/2020 AT 10:15AM | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 6/10/2020 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding. | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FINGER PRINT RESULTS | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 632020DR000054DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/24/2020 | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.