Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Barrick, Daniel L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barrick, Dana L, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NON JURY TRIAL | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NON JURY TRIAL | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event Non Jury Trial on 9/20/2021 0130 PM Judge ROBERT GROEB results Cancelled on 9/3/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Non Jury Trial scheduled on 9/15/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.