Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Blomquist, Nannette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blomquist, Harold, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with FERRERO, DENISE RAE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFERRERO, DENISE RAE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 4/01/2020 AT 10:00AM | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 4/1/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DENISE FERRERO presiding. | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 632020DR000034DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2020 | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 16872 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.