Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cooks, Dannelle R, Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Dannell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Roosevelt Alexander Jr, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FROM DUVAL COUNTY | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF FILE | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE DOCKET | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING FILE TO DUVAL COUNTY | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING HEARING 5/27/2021 MAILED TO ROOSEVELT ALEXANDER WARD JR RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.