Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Jennifer Vasquez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions461 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time462 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 09/10/10 TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $5,608.20 Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
STATUS OF 0002 JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED Not Applicable |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,221.08 FILE RETURNED TO FILE UNIT |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 04/07/10 Not Applicable |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION/NOTICE RE 1033 CCP FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.