Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Rolph, Frances, Rolph, Rodney, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Makris, Dean, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, represented by Paul, Melissa Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with NIMETH, JASON J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516b1A | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ASI PEFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 515431 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 602022CA000353CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/18/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.