Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Truist Bank Successor By Merge, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Marcadis, Ralph Sam, against Connor, John A, Connor Marine Engineering Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with NIMETH, JASON J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN A CONNOR
Date: June 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON JOHN A CONNOR SERVED ON JULY 8 2022 | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON CONNIE KITCHENS FOR CONNOR MARINE ENGINEERING INC SERVED ON JULY 5 2022 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN A CONNOR | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 602022CA000315CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2022 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number M 513573 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.