Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dorman, John I, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dorman, Julienne J, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with MORLEY, MICHELLE T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CAUSES WITHOUT CHILD RELATED ISSUES FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JULIENNE JEAN DORMAN | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JULIENNE JEAN DORMAN | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF IN PERSON MEDIATION | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.