Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bryant, Charles J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manwarren, Gerald Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Event INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 9/10/2019 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge MARY HATCHER presiding. | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S WITNESS LIST | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS THE PETITION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE BECAUSE THE PETITION FAILS TO PROPERLY ALLEGE TWO PRIOR INCIDENTS OF VIOLENCE AS REQUIRED BY SECTION 784.046 OF THE FLORIDA STATUTES | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE RE-ASSIGNMENT | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY JULY 29, 2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.