Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Freeman, Kathy L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Primerano, Daria J, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with R JERALD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2018 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Filed date changed to 5/20/2019 | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE LIST | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SUCCESSFUL SERVED ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 5/20/2019 TO DARIA JOAN PRIMERANO | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINT REPEAT VIOLENCE | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.