Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Florida Insurance C, Walker, Johnny R, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Beckham, Eugene Goff, against Geohazards Inc, represented by Harris, Rebecca Marie, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with William H. Hallman, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam H. Hallman, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryNeglig Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO JUDGE HALLMAN | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSALWITH PREJUDICE | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | STATE FARM'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO GEOHAZARDS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT-AGREEMENT | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STATE FARM'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO GEOHAZARDS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY AS TO MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.