Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Eagle View Cove Tic R Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by V Dancaescu, against Cheryl J Reeves Young, Dorothy N Jackson Master Trust, Dorothy N Jackson Master Trust Dated December 1 1990 As Amended And Restated On September 1 1998, Jl Jackson Deceased, Pamela J Blank, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2024 |
Category14O - Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is an action to quiet title and for declaratory relief regarding real property located in Seminole County, Florida. The Plaintiffs claim ownership of four contiguous parcels of real property and a small strip of property between two of...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHERYL J REEVES YOUNG 04/17/2024
Date: April 16, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAMELA J BLANK 04/17/2024
Date: April 16, 2024PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER
Date: April 16, 2024COMPLAINT FILED
Date: April 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: April 16, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHERYL J REEVES YOUNG 04/17/2024 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAMELA J BLANK 04/17/2024 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION TO JL JACKSON (DECEASED) & HEIRS & DEVISEES OF THE ESTATE OF JL JACKSON DOROTHY N JACKSON ETC ISSUED 04/18/2024 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.