Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Kidwell Group Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Thomas Stevenson, against Security First Insurance Company, represented by Hope Touchton, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category19P - Personal Injury Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF
Date: September 29, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: June 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 8/2/21 (AMND)
Date: August 02, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT
Date: August 04, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/9/21
Date: July 09, 2021MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BY DEFT
Date: September 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 10/1/21 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10/1/21 10:30AM | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BY DEFT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 9/27/21 @ 10:30 AM CTRM B | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 9/27/21 10:30AM | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS CMPL MOTION TO STRIKE RELIEF FOR FEES & COSTS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY DEFT | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 8/2/21 (AMND) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.