Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mary Kelly filed a(n) Pr - Property Only case in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. GALLUZZO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. GALLUZZO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryPr - Property Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL FROM RESTRICTED DEPOSITORY JUDGE GALLUZZO 10/4/22 | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR RELEASE / WITHDRAW OF FUNDS FROM RESTRICTED DEPOSITORY | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REPORT OF CLERK FO THE COURT DATED MARCH 8, 2022 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT OF THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT REGARDING INVENTORY | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.