Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Confidential Party, Lashonda S Harden Obo, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Reddick Pendleton Jr, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
Category06D - Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Hearing |
INJUNCTION REVIEW
Judge: JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PERMANENT ORDER OF INJUNCTION- NO EXPIRATION/ JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/08/2021 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT SHEET AND COURT MINUTES /BOTH PARTIES WERE PRESENT | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE SERVED / SCSO - 10/07/2021 | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE SERVED / SCSO - 10/07/2021 | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: IR HEARING FOR JUDGE [L] ON 11/08/2021 AT 0900AM | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE SET FOR 11/08/2021 AT 9AM @ SCC CR-A; JUDGE RECKSIEDLER | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION RETURNED SERVED / SCSO - 10/04/2021 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE /PETITIONER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLINATION FINAL HEARING/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.