Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donna Thompson, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. GALLUZZO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. GALLUZZO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
CategorySa - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION 10/23/2021 JUDGE GALLUZZOInstrument: 2021140387 | |
October 23, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE GALLUZZO | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF VENUE | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATIONInstrument: 2021136088 | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE GALLUZZO | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEATH | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEATH | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATIONInstrument: 2021129523 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.